+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-1)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {485366/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
485366/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 26, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor