+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {914860/1 Report Adopted
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
914860/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-301 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 27, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
February 9, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 6, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor