+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {980012/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Natural Resources – Complimentary Angler’s License – Disabled Veterans
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-607 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Yeas: 135
February 2, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor