+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (40-5)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (110-28)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators Brochin, Raskin, and Shank
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {688374/1 Report Adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (106-29)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {610219/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 5
April 3, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 28
April 1, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 20, 2013: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor