+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor