+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 16, 2015: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 16, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor