+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-310 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
February 1, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor