+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-1301 through 17-1318 - Article - Business Regulation
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 26, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
February 23, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor