+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {653193/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
653193/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 12, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor