+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (98-38)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {423590/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
423590/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 38
March 8, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor