+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {953225/1 Adopted
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
- Favorable
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
953225/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-104 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 23, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 130
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor