+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {735969/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
735969/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 5-102 - Article - Economic Development
- 10-210.1 - Article - Tax - General
- 10-310 - Article - Tax - General
- 10-702 - Article - Tax - General
- 12-201 - Article - Economic Development
- 12-203 - Article - Economic Development
- 12-207 - Article - Economic Development
- 12-208 - Article - Economic Development
- 12-209 - Article - Economic Development
- 12-210 - Article - Economic Development
- 12-211 - Article - Economic Development
- 9-103 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 31, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor