+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (97-39)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {477379/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (98-36)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {663998/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 39
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 7
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor