+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (95-41)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {803499/1 Report Adopted
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
803499/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 4, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 41
February 25, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor