+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {662318/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
662318/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 3, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 19, 2015: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 19, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (4)
B. Wilson
Type:
Primary Sponsor