+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
- Hearing cancelled
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor