+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-15)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {343823/2 Rejected (16-30)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {343823/1 Rejected (16-31)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-46)
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Zucker) Adopted
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {303928/3 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {763621/1 Rejected (40-89)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {763621/2 Rejected (40-89)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {883893/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-201 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (8)
April 1, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 15
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {343823/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 31
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {343823/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 30
March 14, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 13, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 46
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {763621/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 89
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {763621/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 89
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor