+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (31-14)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (114-24)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {414066/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
- Favorable with Amendments {414066/1
- Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
414066/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 28, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 24
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor