+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {873090/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
873090/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor