+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-5)
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Vote
April 9, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor