+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-44)
- Text - Third - Real Property – Actions to Repossess – Judgment for Tenants and Proof of Rental Licensure
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Rejected
- Floor Committee Amendment {633124/1 Adopted
- Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {253623/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Real Property – Actions to Repossess – Judgment for Tenants and Proof of Rental Licensure
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-401, 8-402, 8-402.1, 8-406 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (88-44)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 44
February 3, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor