+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
- Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
January 26, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor