+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 446
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ivey and Buckel)
- Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
- Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
- Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Recede
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Recede
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Ivey and Buckel)
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments {339931/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-0)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {755068/1 Adopted
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation Expenses - Montgomery County Deer Donation Program
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 10-101, 10-213 - Article - Natural Resources
- 10-746 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 16, 2021: Third Reading Passed (129-0)
- Yeas: 129
February 10, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
December 22, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor