+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (93-45)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-9)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {954738/1 Report Adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-45)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {704962/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 45
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor