+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-1)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {864065/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
864065/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 18, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor