+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-6)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor