+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until later today (Senator Salling) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (33-0)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Third Reading Passed (132-2)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-405 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 5, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 33
March 21, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor