+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-3)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {220317/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
220317/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 14-402 - Article - Health - General
- 14-411 - Article - Health - General
- 5-1202 - Article - Natural Resources
- 5-901 - Article - Natural Resources
- 5-903 - Article - Natural Resources
- 8-1301 - Article - Natural Resources
- 8-1304 - Article - Natural Resources
- 3-603 - Article - Real Property
- 4-402 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 2-1201 - Article - State Government
- 2-1220 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 23, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 21, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor