+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 839934/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 445760/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 30, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 16, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor