+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment 443128/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Third Reading Passed (32-13)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment 833729/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)
- Second Reading Passed
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment 833729/1 (Senator Hershey)
- Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable
- Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (102-30)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable with Amendments 180712/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until later this session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5.5-110 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
March 26, 2019: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 29
March 15, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 13, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 30