+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 112113/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
112113/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-8A-15 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 10, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor