+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {816684/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
816684/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-101 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 23, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 22, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138