+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {943823/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-504 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Yeas: 131
March 17, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
February 3, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor