+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable with Amendments {368578/1
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
- Favorable with Amendments {672819/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-204 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 21, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor