+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (127-0)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {643027/1 Adopted
- Text - Third - Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-712, 4-717 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (127-0)
- Yeas: 127
March 9, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor