+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {176587/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
176587/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-1005 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 8, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor