+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (116-25)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates Sydnor, Queen, and Rey
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {293525/1 Withdrawn
- Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Conway) Adopted (25-20)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {488177/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {488177/1
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {488177/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (101-39)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {492010/1 Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 25
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Conway) Adopted
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 20
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor