+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-2)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-7)
- Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)
- Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {943322/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments {247274/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-4)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {376789/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 2
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 32
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
March 20, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (90)
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor