+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Medical Cannabis - Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina's Law)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-3)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Medical Cannabis - Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina's Law)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {316981/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Medical Cannabis - Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events
- First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 7-446 - Article - Education
- 13-3301, 13-3304, 13-3313 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 13, 2020: Third Reading Passed (130-3)
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 3
February 4, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
February 4, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor