+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (36-0)
- Senate Recede
- Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Report Adopted
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-13)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {843526/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (52-85)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {465466/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 36
March 10, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 13
March 8, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {843526/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 85
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor