+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (111-24)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-14)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {784931/1 Report Adopted
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-14)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {656882/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 24
March 30, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor