+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {952616/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
952616/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 7, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor