+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-2)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Favorable
- Special Order until later today (Senator Serafini) Adopted
- Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {273224/2 Rejected (48-91)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {263425/1 Rejected (47-90)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {333328/1 Rejected (47-92)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (101-37)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {703299/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
- Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (7)
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 37
March 14, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {263425/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 90
March 14, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {273224/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 91
March 14, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (B. Wilson) {333328/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 92
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor