+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 26, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 16, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 15, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor