+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 14, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-406 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2021: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
January 20, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
January 20, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor