+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {635062/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
635062/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor