+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {470712/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
470712/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 31, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 16, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor