+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (123-13)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-503 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 20, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 14, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 12, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor