+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {540610/1 Report Adopted
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendment
540610/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 7, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
March 5, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor