+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-7)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
- Favorable with Amendments {206987/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
206987/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor